Dentists

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070
    (SB1256)
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for ViolationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0438State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0652Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0800 / CH0710
    (SB0934 / CH0711)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of DentistryDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0863 / CH0483
    (SB0698)
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and PracticeDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0879
    (SB0544)
Task Force on Oral Health in MarylandDelegate CullisonIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1512Health Insurance - Dental Preventive Care - CoverageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1782 / CH0037Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0284 / CH0621Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0387 / CH0038Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Senator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0934 / CH0711
    (HB0800 / CH0710)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of DentistrySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1256
    (HB0070)
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for ViolationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:34 A.M.