Developmental Disabilities

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0048 / CH0605
    (SB1066 / CH0343)
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit EntitiesDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0057 / CH0606
    (SB0355 / CH0239)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0061
    (SB0632 / CH0511)
State Brain Injury Trust FundDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0299
    (SB0336)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home RenovationsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0463
    (SB0440)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilityAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0661
    (SB0995)
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English ProficiencyDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0809Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from DisqualificationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0813 / CH0392Task Force to Study the Impact of Expanding Credit and Noncredit Courses for Students with Intellectual and Developmental DisabilitiesDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0839
    (SB1025)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Potomac Community Resources HomeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0974Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot ListDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0976
    (SB0452)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes RenovationsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0997
    (SB0867)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1161 / CH0671Commission on Special Education Access and EquityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1277Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1286
    (SB0691)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1361
    (SB1003)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Easter Seals Inter-Generational Center ExpansionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1419Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Linwood CenterHoward County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0336
    (HB0299)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home RenovationsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0355 / CH0239
    (HB0057 / CH0606)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0440
    (HB0463)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware FacilitySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0452
    (HB0976)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes RenovationsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0632 / CH0511
    (HB0061)
State Brain Injury Trust FundSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0691
    (HB1286)
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children with Disabilities - Burden of ProofSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0867
    (HB0997)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0995
    (HB0661)
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English ProficiencySenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1003
    (HB1361)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Easter Seals Inter-Generational Center ExpansionSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1025
    (HB0839)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Potomac Community Resources HomeSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1066 / CH0343
    (HB0048 / CH0605)
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit EntitiesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.