Developmental Disabilities

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0142Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0261
    (SB0242)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Itineris FoundationDelegate HayesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0287 / CH0306
    (SB0461 / CH0305)
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0337
    (SB0640)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0443Creation of a State Debt - Bay Community Support Services Group HomesDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0496
    (SB0339)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount SchoolDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0558
    (SB0455)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home RenovationsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0786
    (SB0539)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0887Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass MurderDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0944First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
HB1388
    (SB0597)
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant ProgramDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB1394
    (SB0936)
Developmental Disabilities Administration – Community–Based Residential Programs – Definition of Alternative Living UnitDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1411
    (SB0346)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1457Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health ConditionsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1489Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of ProofDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1577Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and FundingDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1618
    (SB0939)
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0242
    (HB0261)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Itineris FoundationSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0339
    (HB0496)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount SchoolSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0346
    (HB1411)
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - ReinstatementSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0455
    (HB0558)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - RCI Group Home RenovationsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0461 / CH0305
    (HB0287 / CH0306)
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of ProhibitionSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0539
    (HB0786)
Correctional Services – Restrictive Housing – LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0597
    (HB1388)
Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant ProgramSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0640
    (HB0337)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0816Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0936
    (HB1394)
Developmental Disabilities Administration – Community–Based Residential Programs – Definition of Alternative Living UnitSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0939
    (HB1618)
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB1013First Responders - Mandatory Autism TrainingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.