Discipline

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070
    (SB0151)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0174Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental ConsentDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0331
    (SB0786 / CH0611)
Education - Behavior Intervention Plans - Physical Restraint and SeclusionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0425 / CH0844
    (SB0651 / CH0843)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0491
    (SB0446)
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive RepresentativesDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0497
    (SB0760)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0523 / CH0814
    (SB0119)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - LicensingDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0698
    (SB0362)
Public Information Act - Records Relating to Alleged Job-Related Misconduct by Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1142Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1222Maryland School Discipline Reform ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1265 / CH0218
    (SB0549 / CH0217)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1287 / CH0762Commission on the School-to-Prison Pipeline and Restorative PracticesDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1372Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot ProgramDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1432 / CH0570Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)Chair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1461
    (SB0980)
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution FundDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
SB0119
    (HB0523 / CH0814)
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - LicensingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0151
    (HB0070)
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0244Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten StudentsSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0362
    (HB0698)
Public Information Act - Records Relating to Alleged Job-Related Misconduct by Law Enforcement OfficersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0446
    (HB0491)
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive RepresentativesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0549 / CH0217
    (HB1265 / CH0218)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 217Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0651 / CH0843
    (HB0425 / CH0844)
Public Schools - Suspensions and ExpulsionsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0710 / CH0727Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental ConsentSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 727Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0760
    (HB0497)
Education - Grounds for DisciplineSenator GuzzoneIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0786 / CH0611
    (HB0331)
Education - Restraint and Seclusion - Consideration and ReportingSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0848Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing AuthoritySenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0908 / CH0849Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedSenator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.