Discrimination

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0318Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0595
    (SB0609)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionDelegate DavisIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0795 / CH0539
    (SB0757 / CH0538)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
HB0895 / CH0648Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 648Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0932 / CH0566
    (SB0832 / CH0565)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1169
    (SB0639 / CH0513)
Civil Rights Tax Relief ActDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1228Commission to Study the Disproportionate Justice Impact on MinoritiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1334Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Appropriations
Human Relations (D5)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1509Public Service Commission - Disparity Study - Contracts and SubcontractsDelegate MizeurIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1527Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination LawsDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHuman Relations (D5)
SB0249Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against DealersSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-25)Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0449Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0609
    (HB0595)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0639 / CH0513
    (HB1169)
Civil Rights Tax Relief ActSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0668Labor and Employment - Right to WorkSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0701Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor ConvictionsSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0727Members of the General Assembly - Whistleblower ProtectionSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0757 / CH0538
    (HB0795 / CH0539)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersHuman Relations (D5)
SB0832 / CH0565
    (HB0932 / CH0566)
Child Care - Dispute ResolutionSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0930 / CH0334Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance AgreementsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1070
    (HB1475)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.