Diseases

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081 / CH0666Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - ConfinementDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0123 / CH0720Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 720Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0190 / CH0220Mammography Centers - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification of Breast Cancer Screening OptionsDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0487
    (SB0267)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0519Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0584 / CH0771
    (SB0572)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActDelegate Young, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0667Health Insurance - Coverage for Lymphedema Diagnosis, Evaluation, and TreatmentDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0675 / CH0676
    (SB0061 / CH0677)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0730 / CH0227Health Insurance - Coverage for Diabetes Test Strips - Prohibition on Deductible, Copayment, and CoinsuranceDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0919 / CH0679)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0847Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Benefits for Individuals Who Are Incarcerated or InstitutionalizedDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0857 / CH0584Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - DefinitionDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1044
    (SB0992)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1233
    (SB0984)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1375 / CH0486
    (SB0781 / CH0485)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CDelegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0038 / CH0040Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and CouncilsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0061 / CH0677
    (HB0675 / CH0676)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0092General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Brain Cancer Awareness DaySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0267
    (HB0487)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0572
    (HB0584 / CH0771)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActSenator SimonaireIn the House - House Refuses to RecedeFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0781 / CH0485
    (HB1375 / CH0486)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0919 / CH0679
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0984
    (HB1233)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
SB0992
    (HB1044)
Oncologists - Dispensing and Insurance Coverage of Orally Administered Cancer ChemotherapySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.