District of Columbia

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0664
    (SB0543)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate HettlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1522Handgun Permits - Universal RecognitionDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0050Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel – EligibilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0543
    (HB0664)
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:22 P.M.