Dogs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0242 / CH0153
    (SB0053 / CH0152)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Health and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0732
    (SB0675 / CH0236)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1564Income Tax Credit - Veterinary ServicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0053 / CH0152
    (HB0242 / CH0153)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0238Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet ExpensesSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0675 / CH0236
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1211Vehicle Laws - Operating Vehicle While Animal on Driver's Seat - ProhibitionSenator SallingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:00 P.M.