Domestic Violence

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0116 / CH0039
    (SB0267 / CH0038)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0461
    (SB0558)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0535Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program FundDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0853
    (SB0417)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0892
    (SB0731)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1037
    (SB0630)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1230
    (SB0490)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate HomeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1259Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1260Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased PenaltiesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1340Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of ProcessDelegate StukesIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0267 / CH0038
    (HB0116 / CH0039)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0417
    (HB0853)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0490
    (HB1230)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0558
    (HB0461)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence CenterHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0630
    (HB1037)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0731
    (HB0892)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0846 / CH0325Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of ProcessSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1024Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - DisseminationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.