Domestic Violence

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental DisorderDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0090Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related CrimeDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0306 / CH0116
    (SB0337 / CH0115)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0307 / CH0112
    (SB0333 / CH0111)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0333
    (SB0028)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0352
    (SB0369 / CH0159)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent OffensesDelegate Valentino-SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0775
    (SB0041)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0986
    (SB0951)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1052
    (SB0805 / CH0342)
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law ActDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1182Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1278Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor ChildDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0028
    (HB0333)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0035 / CH0007Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - DisseminationSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0041
    (HB0775)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0333 / CH0111
    (HB0307 / CH0112)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0334 / CH0113
    (HB0309 / CH0114)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0337 / CH0115
    (HB0306 / CH0116)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0369 / CH0159
    (HB0352)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent OffensesSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0805 / CH0342
    (HB1052)
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0951
    (HB0986)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.