Domestic Violence

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004
    (SB0977)
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Delegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0167
    (SB0578)
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for ReliefDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0819Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Probation and Suspended SentenceDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0866
    (SB0833)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0911Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0946Domestic Violence - Confidentiality of Locations of SheltersDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0947
    (SB0930)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1001
    (SB0943)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate SmithIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1060Model Residential Leases - Required ContentsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1232
    (SB0978)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1371 / CH0651Criminal Law - Strangulation - Lethality Screening Protocol and TrainingDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1380
    (SB0850)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House ShelterDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1396
    (SB0960)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0578
    (HB0167)
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for ReliefSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0833
    (HB0866)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0850
    (HB1380)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House ShelterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0930
    (HB0947)
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording DevicesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0943
    (HB1001)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0960
    (HB1396)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0977
    (HB0004)
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0978
    (HB1232)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1023Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1047 / CH0602Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic ViolenceSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1143 / CH0606Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task ForceSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.