Domestic Violence

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0123 / CH0720Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 720Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0293 / CH0490
    (SB0274)
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence OrderDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0294 / CH0805
    (SB0224 / CH0804)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying CrimeDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805Judiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0484
    (SB0861)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0501Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness EducationDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0634
    (SB0514)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0827Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training WaiverDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1057Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1272Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1297Domestic Violence - Petitioner - Attorney for ChildDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1340
    (SB0785)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1575Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0224 / CH0804
    (HB0294 / CH0805)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying CrimeSenator LeeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0274
    (HB0293 / CH0490)
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence OrderSenator RamirezIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0514
    (HB0634)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0785
    (HB1340)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0861
    (HB0484)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator SmithIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)
SB1030State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness CourseSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:51 A.M.