Domestic Violence

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0065Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and ProbationDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0075State Board of Cosmetologists - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Training RequirementsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0081Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental InjuryDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0155
    (SB0148)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0255Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property RecordsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0328
    (SB0121 / CH0501)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0333
    (SB0208)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Sexual Assault/Spouse Abuse Resource CenterDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0584Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - DisseminationDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0592
    (SB0327)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1238
    (SB1203)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1303 / CH0425
    (SB0491 / CH0426)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective OrdersDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1434Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Housing for Victims of Domestic Violence PG 432-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1523Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence Offender RegistryDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1638
    (SB0788)
Public Information Act - RevisionsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1646 / CH0251
    (SB1036)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1824Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1828Address Confidentiality Programs - Obtaining or Disclosing Protected Information - Prohibitions and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0121 / CH0501
    (HB0328)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0148
    (HB0155)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0208
    (HB0333)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Sexual Assault/Spouse Abuse Resource CenterSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0327
    (HB0592)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0491 / CH0426
    (HB1303 / CH0425)
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective OrdersSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0578 / CH0424
    (HB0633 / CH0423)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0788
    (HB1638)
Public Information Act - RevisionsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1036
    (HB1646 / CH0251)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1203
    (HB1238)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:58 P.M.