Dorchester County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0717
    (SB0530 / CH0072)
Dorchester County - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Minimum Seating RequirementDorchester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0742Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0766 / CH0117Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0774
    (SB0138)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Dorchester County Family YMCADelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0907
    (SB0391)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational CenterDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1167 / CH0503
    (SB0680)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1168 / CH0504
    (SB0681)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1203
    (SB0972)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1222
    (SB0392)
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - ExemptionsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
HB1350
    (SB0707 / CH0420)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1630Dorchester County Board of Education - Nonprofessional Personnel Appointment - Advice and ConsentDelegate AdamsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0138
    (HB0774)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Dorchester County Family YMCASenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0391
    (HB0907)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational CenterSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0392
    (HB1222)
Dorchester County - Recycling at Special Events - ExemptionsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0530 / CH0072
    (HB0717)
Dorchester County - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Minimum Seating RequirementSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0680
    (HB1167 / CH0503)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0681
    (HB1168 / CH0504)
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income AreasSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0707 / CH0420
    (HB1350)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0972
    (HB1203)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.