Dorchester County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0297 / CH0054
    (SB0051 / CH0055)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine FestivalsDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0298 / CH0056
    (SB0140 / CH0057)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses - Catering Club EventsDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 56Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0321 / CH0052
    (SB0003 / CH0053)
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance RestrictionsDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0330 / CH0174
    (SB0215 / CH0175)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0554 / CH0820
    (SB0436 / CH0821)
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ SalariesCaroline County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1275
    (SB0710)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community CenterDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1367
    (SB1040)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0003 / CH0053
    (HB0321 / CH0052)
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance RestrictionsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0051 / CH0055
    (HB0297 / CH0054)
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer and Wine FestivalsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0140 / CH0057
    (HB0298 / CH0056)
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club EventsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0215 / CH0175
    (HB0330 / CH0174)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0436 / CH0821
    (HB0554 / CH0820)
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ SalariesCaroline County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0710
    (HB1275)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community CenterSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1040
    (HB1367)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot PointSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1056 / CH0606Rural Health Collaborative PilotSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.