Dredging

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1155
    (SB0466)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1451Environment - Marine Contractor Services - License ExceptionsDelegate VitaleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Environment (M3)
HB1539
    (SB1096)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanDelegate SmigielIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Environment (M3)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0466
    (HB1155)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1096
    (HB1539)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.