Driver Education

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0912
    (SB0768)
Driver Education Program - Classroom Instruction - Organ, Eye, and Tissue Donation EducationDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1336Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0768
    (HB0912)
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.