Driver Education

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0126)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0559Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0627
    (SB0708)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsDelegate GilchristIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0720 / CH0402
    (SB0544 / CH0401)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement FundDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0967
    (SB0423)
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop ProceduresDelegate CassillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1039Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures and Basic Vehicle MaintenanceDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1224Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0126
    (HB0008)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0423
    (HB0967)
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop ProceduresSenator NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0544 / CH0401
    (HB0720 / CH0402)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement FundSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0708
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.