Driver Education

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0118Vehicle Laws – Drivers’ Education Schools – Age of Instruction VehiclesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0142Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0394
    (SB0424 / CH0505)
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0889Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel ParkingDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0998Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Schools - Age of Instruction VehiclesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1099
    (SB0868)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1161 / CH0195
    (SB0856 / CH0196)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsDelegate BrooksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1375Driver Education Curriculum - Rights of Drivers Involved in Traffic StopsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1462
    (SB0701)
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human TraffickingDelegate EbersoleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0424 / CH0505
    (HB0394)
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum DurationSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0701
    (HB1462)
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human TraffickingSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0856 / CH0196
    (HB1161 / CH0195)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured MotoristsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0868
    (HB1099)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.