Drivers' Licenses

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or PermitsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0036Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0171
    (SB0040)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)Delegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0197
    (SB0271)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0393Vehicle Laws - Driving While License Refused, Suspended, Canceled, or Revoked - PenaltyDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0500Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Expiration of Learner's Instructional PermitDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0659Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Veteran Status - Acceptable DocumentationDelegate BotelerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0753 / CH0637
    (SB0339 / CH0638)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and PenaltiesDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0772
    (SB0399)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Delegate IveyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0801 / CH0641Vehicle Laws - Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 641Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0911Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Issuance, Renewal, and ExpirationDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1336Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0040
    (HB0171)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0075 / CH0019Motor Vehicle Administration - Investigative Division - Issuance of CitationsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0271
    (HB0197)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - PenaltiesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0292Vehicle Laws - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Suspension Modification and Restrictive LicensesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0293Vehicle Laws - Judgment Debtors - License and Registration Suspension - ModificationSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0312Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - First Aid and Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation (CPR) Training RequirementSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0339 / CH0638
    (HB0753 / CH0637)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and PenaltiesSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0399
    (HB0772)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0645Homestead Property Tax Credit - Principal Residency - Information from Motor Vehicle Administration and CountiesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0715 / CH0309
    (HB0789)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013Senator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 309Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.