Drivers' Licenses

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young PersonsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0176 / CH0710
    (SB0299)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0205Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0244
    (SB1163)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberyDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0330Vehicle Laws - Young Drivers - Hour RestrictionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0539Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0563Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - IssuanceDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0844
    (SB0799 / CH0488)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0969Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt BikeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1013
    (SB0902)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1047
    (SB0906 / CH0204)
Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License SuspensionDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB1490Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0089Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing AddressSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0290 / CH0725Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and ReinstatementSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 725Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0299
    (HB0176 / CH0710)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent KnollsSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0342Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - RequirementsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0470Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0799 / CH0488
    (HB0844)
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of PointsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0902
    (HB1013)
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0906 / CH0204
    (HB1047)
Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License SuspensionSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0979 / CH0694Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and SnowmobilesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 694Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1097Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of SykesvilleSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1163
    (HB0244)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberySenator PetersIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:40 A.M.