Drunk and Drugged Driving

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0032Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0556
    (SB0468)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0765
    (SB0959)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonyDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1336Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1490Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - ProhibitionDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0074Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0292Vehicle Laws - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Suspension Modification and Restrictive LicensesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0468
    (HB0556)
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised ProbationSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0850
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0959
    (HB0765)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.