Drunk and Drugged Driving

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102
    (SB0093)
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0395Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0423
    (SB0212)
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate Young, K.In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0430 / CH0247Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se OffensesDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0532Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory TestsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0872Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0093
    (HB0102)
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0212
    (HB0423)
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System ProgramSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0232Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0395Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0517Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug ParaphernaliaSenator ZirkinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0605Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator RaskinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.