Drunk and Drugged Driving

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0047Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0157 / CH0518Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0182Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0334Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0345Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0348
    (SB0041)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0612Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - PenaltyDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0630Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked LicenseDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0665Constitutional Amendment - Marijuana - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0735
    (SB0763)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0773 / CH0630
    (SB1008)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 630Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0864
    (SB0302)
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1196Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1306Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle ForfeitureDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1364
    (SB1039)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1367
    (SB0970)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1393Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving - Mandatory Minimum SentencesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0041
    (HB0348)
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0152Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for IntoxicationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0160 / CH0517Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0302
    (HB0864)
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0763
    (HB0735)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0891Criminal Law - Use and Possession of MarijuanaSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0945 / CH0512
    (HB1342)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Senator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0970
    (HB1367)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1008
    (HB0773 / CH0630)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1039
    (HB1364)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.