Easements

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0789
    (SB0709)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0861
    (SB0259 / CH0287)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Agriculture (M4)
HB1352 / CH0654
    (SB0964)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1437Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial HardshipDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0071 / CH0012Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of EasementChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0259 / CH0287
    (HB0861)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters Agriculture (M4)
SB0709
    (HB0789)
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation EasementsSenator DysonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0964
    (HB1352 / CH0654)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.