Easements

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043 / CH0303Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0198 / CH0293Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – ExemptionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0609 / CH0089
    (SB0360)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0784 / CH0773Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice RequirementsDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 773Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0794
    (SB0692)
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - LocationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1120Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism ActivitiesDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1168
    (SB1125)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface MiningDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
HB1229 / CH0066Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1230 / CH0170
    (SB0960 / CH0171)
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or AlterationDelegate BuckelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1345Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV AreasDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1351 / CH0492Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion EventsDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1736
    (SB1140 / CH0623)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot ReleaseDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAgriculture (M4)
SB0360
    (HB0609 / CH0089)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0571 / CH0644Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0692
    (HB0794)
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - LocationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0885 / CH0622Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under EasementSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0960 / CH0171
    (HB1230 / CH0170)
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or AlterationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0997Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1125
    (HB1168)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface MiningSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesAgriculture (M4)
SB1140 / CH0623
    (HB1736)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of ChildSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1235Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit TransferSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.