Education, State Board of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0517
    (SB0434)
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for ProposalsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0532
    (SB0537)
Education - Maryland Advisory Council for Virtual Learning - ResponsibilitiesDelegate SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0684Tobacco-Free Schools ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0843State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation RequirementDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0844
    (SB0694)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0855Student Health and Fitness ActDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0875Education - Public Schools - Parent EmpowermentDelegate BatesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1376
    (SB0734)
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation RequirementDelegate GriffithIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0434
    (HB0517)
State Board of Education - Social Impact Bonds - Request for ProposalsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0537
    (HB0532)
State Board of Education - Online Courses - Graduation RequirementSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0694
    (HB0844)
Public School Teachers - Certification - Continuing EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0734
    (HB1376)
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation RequirementSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0775Education - Model Performance Evaluation Criteria - ImplementationSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0926 / CH0581Education - State and Local Aid Program for Certification or Renewal of Certification - Sunset RepealSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.