Education, State Board of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0076Education - Implementation of the Common Core State Standards - ProhibitionDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0166
    (SB0449)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0316State Board of Education - Training Video on Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External DefibrillatorsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0384
    (SB0290 / CH0480)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0423Education - Implementation of Next Generation Science Standards - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0571School Counselors - Role Expansion in Public Middle and High SchoolsDelegate KaiserIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0764Education - Academic Standards and Curriculum - Common Core State Standards Implementation ProhibitedDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0893Education - Local School System AutonomyDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0922
    (SB0857 / CH0566)
Physical Education and Athletic Programs for Students With Disabilities - FundingDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1138Education - County Boards of Education - Control and Management of Public SchoolsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1145Maintenance of Effort - Qualifying Nonrecurring Costs - Methods of ApprovalDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1167 / CH0545
    (SB0676 / CH0544)
Teachers and Principals - Performance Evaluation Criteria - Use of Student Growth DataDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 545Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1181 / CH0370
    (SB1066 / CH0369)
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting RequirementsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1398Frederick County Board of Education - Discipline RegulationsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1400County Boards of Education - Discipline RegulationsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1418Education - Curriculum Content - Vocational Education and Training ProgramsDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1428Student Health and Fitness ActDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1429State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation RequirementDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1453 / CH0481
    (SB1062)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0290 / CH0480
    (HB0384)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0449
    (HB0166)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0579Education - Evaluation of Teachers and Principals - Implementation TimelineSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0676 / CH0544
    (HB1167 / CH0545)
Teachers and Principals - Performance Evaluation Criteria - Use of Student Growth DataSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0857 / CH0566
    (HB0922)
Physical Education and Athletic Programs for Students With Disabilities - FundingSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0911Education - Performance Evaluation Criteria - Default ModelSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1007State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation RequirementSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1049Education - Required Number of School Days - ExceptionSenator GettyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1062
    (HB1453 / CH0481)
Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating CommissionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB1066 / CH0369
    (HB1181 / CH0370)
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting RequirementsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.