Elderly Persons

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0147 / CH0206Healthy Aging ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0199 / CH0116Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities CentersChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0233 / CH0166
    (SB0666 / CH0165)
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent ActsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 166Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0350Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0356Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore CityDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0368Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)Delegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0388
    (SB0322)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0546
    (SB0454)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends HouseDelegate KaiserIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0601 / CH0673
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0643Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - EligibilityDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0672
    (SB0920)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities FacilityDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0948Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard ServicesDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0990Harford County - BingoHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1092
    (SB0821)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational CenterDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1269 / CH0060
    (SB0251 / CH0059)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited IncomeAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1389
    (SB0295)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1418Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1444Retire in Maryland Act of 2017Delegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1472
    (SB0985)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1473
    (SB1082)
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0248
    (HB0601 / CH0673)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0251 / CH0059
    (HB1269 / CH0060)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited IncomeSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0295
    (HB1389)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0322
    (HB0388)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0408Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0454
    (HB0546)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Friends HouseSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0601Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - EligibilitySenator BatesIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0666 / CH0165
    (HB0233 / CH0166)
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent ActsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0821
    (HB1092)
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational CenterSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0903Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding RequirementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation
Public Health (J1)
SB0920
    (HB0672)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities FacilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0985
    (HB1472)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 65 Years OldSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1006Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1082
    (HB1473)
Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:35 A.M.