Elections Supervisors

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0113
    (SB0173)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0196 / CH0198
    (SB0171 / CH0197)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0217
    (SB0373)
Early Voting Access Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0242
    (SB0519)
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting CentersDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0427Election Law - Absentee Ballots - TimelinessDelegate ImpallariaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0592Election Law - Reporting of Precinct ResultsDelegate KaiserIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0703Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0729
    (SB0367)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0974Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot ListDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1234Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of NamesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Elections (G1)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0108Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0171 / CH0197
    (HB0196 / CH0198)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by MailSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0304 / CH0223Calvert County - Election Judges - CompensationSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0309Election Law - Local Board Employees - QualificationsSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0367
    (HB0729)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialitySenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0373
    (HB0217)
Early Voting Access Act of 2013Senator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0519
    (HB0242)
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting CentersSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0840 / CH0567Voting - Notice of Election by Specimen BallotSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0901Election Law - Elections by MailSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0993Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.