Elections, State Board of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0542Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting RightsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0662
    (SB0256)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0763Campaign Finance Reports - Business Contributors - Registration StatusDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0767Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign InterferenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0785Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1014Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports WageringDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1278 / CH0523Election Law - Postelection Tabulation AuditDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1326Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1331 / CH0524Election Law - CybersecurityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1407Maryland Electricians Act - RevisionsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1658
    (SB1126)
Election Law – Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and MarkingDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1703Election Law - Failure to File Campaign Finance Report or Affidavit - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
HB1717 / CH0552State Government - Protection of Information - Voter Registration NumbersDelegate WilkinsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1805Election Law - Fund-Raising and Donations in Connection With a Campaign - Prohibition on FirearmsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0049 / CH0805
    (HB0158 / CH0804)
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - SalarySenator SimonaireEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0221Election Law – State Administrator of Elections – TermSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0246State Personnel - Maryland Hatch ActSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0256
    (HB0662)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0357Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0374Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0547Election Law - Elections by MailSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0591Elections - Absentee Ballot Application - Required InformationSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0592Joint Committee on Election Oversight - EstablishmentSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0836Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports WageringSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0940Election Law - Polling Places - Election JudgesSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1126
    (HB1658)
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and MarkingSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.