Electronic Commerce

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0316
    (SB0374 / CH0246)
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy ProtectionDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0432
    (SB0316)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEthics (G2)
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0497
    (SB0852)
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt RequirementsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0550
    (SB0365)
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the BlindDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0590Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1216 / CH0289
    (SB0581 / CH0288)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization FormsDelegate Kelly, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1365
    (SB0823)
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to ConsumersDelegate HowardIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1463Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of FeesDelegate FrickIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB1487Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0272State Lottery Agency - Tickets - Electronic Devices Connected to the InternetSenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0365
    (HB0550)
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the BlindSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0374 / CH0246
    (HB0316)
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy ProtectionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0581 / CH0288
    (HB1216 / CH0289)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization FormsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0769 / CH0318Health Benefit Plans - Proposed Rate Increases - Notice to InsuredsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0823
    (HB1365)
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to ConsumersSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0852
    (HB0497)
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt RequirementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.