Electronic Commerce

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0209Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15Howard County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0670
    (SB0700)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0699
    (SB0434)
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium IncreaseDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0726Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0744 / CH0453Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web SitesDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0760
    (SB0557)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0972Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and CoverageDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1065
    (SB0190)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1078
    (SB0559)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1231
    (SB0868 / CH0204)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network ServicesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 a.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1255
    (SB0936)
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for ViolationsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0190
    (HB1065)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0434
    (HB0699)
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium IncreaseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0557
    (HB0760)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0559
    (HB1078)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0608Property and Casualty Insurance - Notices, Policies, and Proof of Insurance - Electronic FormatChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0700
    (HB0670)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0868 / CH0204
    (HB1231)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire TransportationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0936
    (HB1255)
Maryland Locksmith Act - Public Lists of Licensees - Remedies for ViolationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.