Electronic Commerce

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0071
    (SB0514)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0853Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit CardsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1241Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With and Reimbursement of PharmacistsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0334Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider DirectoriesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0514
    (HB0071)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0976Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and RegulationSenator PetersIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.