Electronic Commerce

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0813 / CH0447
    (SB0438 / CH0448)
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - ProhibitionDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsGaming (C7)
HB0965
    (SB0552)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - ModificationsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0974 / CH0518
    (SB0525)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1114
    (SB0892)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1364State Government - eCheck Payments - Prohibition on Convenience FeeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0311
    (HB0426)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0438 / CH0448
    (HB0813 / CH0447)
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - ProhibitionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0463Business Regulation - Limited Residential LodgingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0525
    (HB0974 / CH0518)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0552
    (HB0965)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - ModificationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0892
    (HB1114)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1200Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Referred Economic MattersFinance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:46 P.M.