Electronic Funds Transfer

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0035Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0240Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll RatesDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0300
    (SB1108)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0523 / CH0107E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized ChargesDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0639 / CH0109Health Insurance - Provider Claims - Payment by Credit Card or Electronic Funds Transfer Payment MethodDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0088 / CH0341Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special FundsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0697Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Purchase of Beer by Retail Dealers From Manufacturers and WholesalersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1108
    (HB0300)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Favorable Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.