Electricians

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0208 / CH0052
    (SB0163 / CH0051)
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0246 / CH0254Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and FeesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1368Electricians - Local Licenses - RepealDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1470Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or TradeDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0163 / CH0051
    (HB0208 / CH0052)
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:43 P.M.