Electronic Surveillance

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0116 / CH0039
    (SB0267 / CH0038)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0377Criminal Procedure - Court Order - Location of Mobile Communications DeviceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0682Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0887Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location PrivacyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1233Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of DronesDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0122Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Prince George's County - Community Safety and Surveillance SystemsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0182Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - ProhibitionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0267 / CH0038
    (HB0116 / CH0039)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid FraudSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1006Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited ActsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.