Electronic Surveillance

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0115Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) DevicesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0116Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0277Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0289
    (SB0699 / CH0192)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0633Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0785Drones - Unauthorized SurveillanceDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0847
    (SB0926)
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - LimitationsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0924
    (SB0950)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1074Fourth Amendment Protection ActDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1161
    (SB0698 / CH0191)
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - OrderDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0239Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0698 / CH0191
    (HB1161)
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - OrderSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0699 / CH0192
    (HB0289)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0926
    (HB0847)
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - LimitationsSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0950
    (HB0924)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.