Electronic Surveillance

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0065Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and ProbationDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0231Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0314
    (SB0431)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologyDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0328
    (SB0121 / CH0501)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0447 / CH0771
    (SB1156)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 771Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0453
    (SB0209)
Baltimore County - Uniformed Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officer - Body CameraDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0480
    (SB0484)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - FeesDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0495Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras - OffenseDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0510Criminal Procedure - Providing Electronic Device Location Information - Historical DataDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0578Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance TechnologiesDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0922 / CH0211Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose ReportDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1087 / CH0338
    (SB0758 / CH0339)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0121 / CH0501
    (HB0328)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0209
    (HB0453)
Baltimore County – Uniformed Off–Duty Law Enforcement Officer – Body CameraSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0363Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0431
    (HB0314)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0484
    (HB0480)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - FeesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0577Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage IndividualsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0758 / CH0339
    (HB1087 / CH0338)
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - LicensureSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1156
    (HB0447 / CH0771)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentSenator SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:41 A.M.