Emergency Medical Services

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0360 / CH0106Health Insurance - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of LawChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0364 / CH0107Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)Delegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0890
    (SB0610 / CH0299)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB1004
    (SB0774 / CH0546)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolDelegate CardinIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1007
    (SB0744)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf CourseDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1248Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company MemberDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1304
    (SB0661)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1314
    (SB0681)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1417
    (SB0929)
Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction - Graduation RequirementDelegate LeeIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0213Emergency Medical Services - Automated External Defibrillators - Immunity from LiabilitySenator JacobsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0222
    (HB0322)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0610 / CH0299
    (HB0890)
Health - Overdose Response Program - EstablishmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0621 / CH0066
    (HB0889)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0661
    (HB1304)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0681
    (HB1314)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0774 / CH0546
    (HB1004)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air PatrolSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0929
    (HB1417)
Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction - Graduation RequirementSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.