Emergencies

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsDelegate JonesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0302
    (SB0028)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0319
    (SB0255)
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations CenterDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0566 / CH0261Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency ActionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0591 / CH0098
    (SB0001)
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions During State of EmergencyDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0787Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0852 / CH0460Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and ModelsDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0926
    (SB0321 / CH0126)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Police Behavioral Health Units - Pilot ProgramDelegate SydnorVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB10302-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or HotlineDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1073Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention StudyDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1080 / CH0116
    (SB0576)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1116Public Schools - Student Suicide Intervention - Required ProceduresDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1219Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1224 / CH0303Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and IceChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0001
    (HB0591 / CH0098)
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions During State of EmergencySenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0026Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme TemperaturesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0028
    (HB0302)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0255
    (HB0319)
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Emergency Operations CenterSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0321 / CH0126
    (HB0926)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Police Behavioral Health Units - Pilot ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Safety (E4)
SB0359Calvert County - Contracts and Purchasing - Bidding ProcessCalvert County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0542 / CH0358Maryland Cybersecurity Council - EstablishmentSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0576
    (HB1080 / CH0116)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Senator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0601 / CH0371
    (HB0130)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.