Emergencies

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0125 / CH0377Environment - Emergency Action Plans for DamsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0193Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and DrillsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0228
    (SB0546)
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population ProtectionDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0251 / CH0435
    (SB0323)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0269 / CH0637
    (SB0531 / CH0638)
Housing Navigator and Aftercare ProgramDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0522 / CH0035
    (SB0427 / CH0034)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Delegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0547Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0668Health Occupations Boards - Regulations and Policy Interpretations - Notice and Public Meeting RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0856
    (SB0693)
Co-Prescribing Naloxone Saves Lives Act of 2017Delegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0984
    (SB0475)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
HB0995Workers' Compensation - Covered Employees - Performance of Essential Services During State of EmergencyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1009Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - ModificationDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1061 / CH0327Education - Emergency and Evacuation Plans - Individuals With DisabilitiesDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1356Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Entry Into Public Roadways - Regulations by Municipal CorporationsDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationMunicipalities (L3)
HB1533
    (SB0658)
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - ProhibitionDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1642
    (SB1169 / CH0733)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0153Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of EmergencySenator KingIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0169 / CH0721Health - Cost of Emergency Room Visits to Treat Dental Conditions and Coverage of Dental Services Under Medicaid - StudySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 721Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0261 / CH0745Property Tax Credit - Residential Property Damaged by Natural DisasterSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 745Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0268 / CH0399
    (HB0211 / CH0398)
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on ContestsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0323
    (HB0251 / CH0435)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0427 / CH0034
    (HB0522 / CH0035)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0475
    (HB0984)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0531 / CH0638
    (HB0269 / CH0637)
Housing Navigator and Aftercare ProgramSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0546
    (HB0228)
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population ProtectionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0658
    (HB1533)
Termination of Electric or Gas Service - ProhibitionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0693
    (HB0856)
Co-Prescribing Naloxone Saves Lives Act of 2017Senator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0903Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding RequirementsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation
Public Health (J1)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB1130Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and ContractsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB1169 / CH0733
    (HB1642)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 733Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.