Energy Matters

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0235 / CH0231Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning VehiclesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0323 / CH0239
    (SB0262)
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy CodesDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0336Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0377
    (SB0373)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)Delegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0378Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0453Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Battery for Backup PowerDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0508Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0516
    (SB0009)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0636
    (SB0154)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0656Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0825Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable GeneratorsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0933Energy Efficiency and Demand Management Programs and Services - RepealDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1042Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control TechnologiesDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1087 / CH0347
    (SB0481)
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1210Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of ModificationsDelegate CassillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0009
    (HB0516)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0154
    (HB0636)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0262
    (HB0323 / CH0239)
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy CodesSenator JenningsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0373
    (HB0377)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)Senator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0382Electric Companies - Customer Choice of Electricity Supplier - Smart MetersSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0398 / CH0346Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0441 / CH0172Maryland Energy Administration - Annual Report - GrantsSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 172Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0481
    (HB1087 / CH0347)
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System ProgramSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0509Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0616Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0682Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With VirginiaSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0714 / CH0378Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting and Sunset ExtensionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0762Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0826Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy AdministrationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0892Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control TechnologiesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEnvironment (M3)
SB0914Electric Companies - Definition by ClassSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.