Energy Matters

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0019Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant AmountsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0316Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual MileageDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0529
    (SB0282)
Renewable Energy – Tier 2 Eligibility – ExtensionDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0812
    (SB0691)
Electric Facilities - Condemnation - Conserved LandDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0866Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic TechnologiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0878Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0912Task Force on Electric Power Grid SecurityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0934
    (SB0557)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergyDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1274Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer RightsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1453
    (SB0732)
Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018Delegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1481 / CH0680
    (SB0648 / CH0681)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1491 / CH0532Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and SubmeteringDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1588 / CH0286Zoning Amendments – Energy Generating SystemsDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0177Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 ApplicantsSenator MannoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0282
    (HB0529)
Renewable Energy – Tiers 1 and 2 Sources – Modifications and Compliance FeeSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0557
    (HB0934)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergySenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0603Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standards - SourcesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0648 / CH0681
    (HB1481 / CH0680)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0688Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - RevisionsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0691
    (HB0812)
Electric Facilities – Condemnation – Conserved LandSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0732
    (HB1453)
Renewable Energy and Job DevelopmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0957Income Tax Credits - Poultry Houses - LED Lighting and Solar Panel SystemsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB1234Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Zero-Emission VehiclesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1251 / CH0069Property Tax - Municipal Corporations - Electricity Generation Facilities - Negotiated Payments in Lieu of TaxesCaroline County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:09 P.M.