Engineers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0347 / CH0613Professional Engineers - Firm PermitsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0353 / CH0102Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Licensing - ExaminationsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0355 / CH0104State Board of Stationary Engineers - Qualifications for Stationary Engineer's Examination - Grade 1 and Grade 2Chair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0534
    (SB0438)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0757 / CH0138Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services ContractsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0438
    (HB0534)
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United StatesSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.