Engineers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0246 / CH0254Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and FeesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0470
    (SB0235 / CH0230)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Service Performed by Person Practicing EngineeringDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0679 / CH0296
    (SB0395 / CH0297)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - PersonnelSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1062Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm PermitsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0235 / CH0230
    (HB0470)
Sales and Use Tax - Declaration of Legislative Intent - ServicesSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0395 / CH0297
    (HB0679 / CH0296)
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - PersonnelSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:55 P.M.