Enterprise Zones

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0278
    (SB0415)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0531
    (SB0181)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0858Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - ExpansionDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1034Income Tax - Job Creation Tax Credit - Long-Term Unemployed IndividualsDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1255
    (SB0843 / CH0582)
Tax Credits - Evaluations and Sunset ProvisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1282Health Enterprise Zone Practitioners - Trauma-Informed Care - TrainingDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1533 / CH0604
    (SB1062 / CH0603)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0076 / CH0156Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - ScheduleChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0181
    (HB0531)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0386
    (HB0450)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0415
    (HB0278)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0560One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0843 / CH0582
    (HB1255)
Tax Credits - EvaluationsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1062 / CH0603
    (HB1533 / CH0604)
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment AreasSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.