Enterprise Zones

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0342 / CH0129Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Extension MC 3-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0394
    (SB0317 / CH0149)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017SpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1007
    (SB0364)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1051
    (SB1021)
Enterprise Zone and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Programs - Small Business EntitiesDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1284Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - National Historic LandmarksDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1391
    (SB0801)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BreweryDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0364
    (HB1007)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Business Incubators, Enterprise Zones, and Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise ZonesSenator FergusonIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0801
    (HB1391)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BrewerySenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1021
    (HB1051)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017Senator ZuckerIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:29 P.M.