Environment, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027 / CH0394Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Environment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0156
    (SB0133 / CH0153)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0216 / CH0409
    (SB0200)
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or SaleDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0326Environment - Monocacy River Watershed - Water Resources PlanDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0449 / CH0481
    (SB0409 / CH0480)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0509 / CH0254Environment - Statute of Limitations - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0514 / CH0429
    (SB0258)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0603Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task ForceDelegate Robinson, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0773Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0874
    (SB0042)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0883
    (SB0438)
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to MunicipalitiesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0982
    (SB0684)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0987
    (SB0693)
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact AnalysisDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1073Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention StudyDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0036Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0042
    (HB0874)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0083 / CH0322Environment - Vibrio Public Information CampaignSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0133 / CH0153
    (HB0156)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0258
    (HB0514 / CH0429)
Maryland Commission on Climate ChangeSenator PinskyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0409 / CH0480
    (HB0449 / CH0481)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsSenator MontgomeryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0438
    (HB0883)
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to MunicipalitiesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0588
    (HB0481)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealPresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0684
    (HB0982)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0693
    (HB0987)
Environment - Ambient Air Quality Control - Cumulative Air Impact AnalysisSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0863 / CH0124Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - RevisionsSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.